www.citizenssb.com
Louisiana
Washington
Bogalusa
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
30270
1945
FDIC Certificate Number: 30270
FDIC's unique number: 43104
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1014376
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1945-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Savings And Loan Association Of Washington Parish.
1994-01-03 Changed name to Citizens Savings Bank .
1994-01-03 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
Total assets: $237,749,000
Total deposits: $203,554,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $203,554,000
Equity capital: $20,730,000
Net income: $739,000
Return on Assets: 0.62
Return on Equity: 7.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Citizens Savings Bank - Angie Branch
Citizens Savings Bank - Barker's Corner Branch
Citizens Savings Bank - Bogalusa Branch
Citizens Savings Bank - Citizens Savings Bank
Citizens Savings Bank - Citizens Savings Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1421