Iowa – Jones – Anamosa
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.citizensbankia.com
Iowa
Jones
Anamosa
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
10125
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 10125
FDIC's unique number: 6478
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 758842
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1906-11-08 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Savings Bank.
1986-02-14 Acquired First National Bank Of Tipton in Tipton, Iowa.
1998-01-16 Reorganized.
Total assets: $110,559,000
Total deposits: $97,331,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $97,331,000
Equity capital: $10,009,000
Net income: $1,006,000
Return on Assets: 1.79
Return on Equity: 21.35
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Community Bancshares Corp.
Citizens Savings Bank - Cedar Branch
Citizens Savings Bank - Citizens Savings Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15281