Vermont – Caledonia – Saint Johnsbury
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Vermont
Caledonia
Saint Johnsbury
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14169
1886
FDIC Certificate Number: 14169
FDIC's unique number: 8845
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 296102
Report Date: 2003-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-06-20
1886-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Savings Bank And Trust Company.
1975-11-24 Moved bank headquarters from St. Johnsbury, Vermont to Saint Johnsbury, Vermont.
2003-05-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank in Morrisville, Vermont.
2008-04-07 Moved bank headquarters from Saint Johnsbury, Vermont to Morrisville, Vermont.
Total assets: $103,129,000
Total deposits: $89,454,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Savings Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Savings Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Savings Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8003