Kansas – Nemaha – Seneca
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Nemaha
Seneca
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15055
1894
FDIC Certificate Number: 15055
FDIC's unique number: 9442
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 599652
Report Date: 1999-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-03-29
1894-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens' State Bank Of Seneca, Kansas.
1983-05-13 Changed name to Citizens State Bank And Trust Company .
1993-10-21 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2000-01-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Gold Bank in Leawood, Kansas.
2000-03-07 Acquired First Business Bank Of Kansas City, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
2000-03-24 FDIC certificate number changed to .
2000-03-24 Acquired Linn County Bank in La Cygne, Kansas.
2001-07-09 Acquired Provident Bank, F.S.B. in St. Joseph, Missouri.
2004-04-03 Acquired Gold Bank in Hennessey, Oklahoma.
2004-09-01 Acquired Gold Bank in Bradenton, Florida.
2006-04-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of M&I; Marshall and Ilsley Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2007-06-27 Acquired United Heritage Bank in Orlando, Florida.
2007-08-01 Acquired Excel Bank Minnesota in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2008-02-02 Acquired First Indiana Bank, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2010-07-01 Acquired Southwest Bank, An M&i; Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2011-07-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BMO Harris Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
Total assets: $69,122,000
Total deposits: $55,031,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens State Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens State Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens State Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5313