New Hampshire – Sullivan – Claremont
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Sullivan
Claremont
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
22487
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 22487
FDIC's unique number: 15681
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 42804
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-04-09
1977-07-01 Institution established. Original name: City Bank And Trust.
1991-03-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $116,044,000
Total deposits: $119,406,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
City Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with City Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and City Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13742