New Hampshire – Coos – Colebrook
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Coos
Colebrook
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18025
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 18025
FDIC's unique number: 11954
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 50902
Report Date: 1974-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-10-05
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Colebrook Guaranty Savings Bank.
1975-01-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First Colebrook Bank in Colebrook, New Hampshire.
1985-07-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $16,385,000
Total deposits: $15,199,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Colebrook Guaranty Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Colebrook Guaranty Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Colebrook Guaranty Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2513