Texas – Coleman – Coleman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.colemanbank.com
Texas
Coleman
Coleman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15480
1936
FDIC Certificate Number: 15480
FDIC's unique number: 9785
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 761954
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1936-10-15 Institution established. Original name: Coleman Bank.
1985-01-16 Changed name to Coleman County State Bank .
Total assets: $76,475,000
Total deposits: $68,639,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $68,639,000
Equity capital: $7,747,000
Net income: $721,000
Return on Assets: 1.97
Return on Equity: 20.24
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Coleman Bancshares, Inc.
Coleman County State Bank - Coleman County Branch
Coleman County State Bank - Coleman County State Bank
Coleman County State Bank - Drive-In Branch
Coleman County State Bank - Www.Colemanbank.com
No associations
LandOfFree
Coleman County State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Coleman County State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Coleman County State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5619