Georgia – Dodge – Eastman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Dodge
Eastman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19792
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 19792
FDIC's unique number: 13586
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 169233
Report Date: 2008-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-13
1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Chester.
1983-05-20 Changed name to Bank Of Dodge County .
1985-09-30 Reorganized.
1994-02-14 Moved bank headquarters from Chester, Georgia to Eastman, Georgia.
1994-02-14 Changed name to The Bank Of Dodge County .
2000-08-31 Changed name to Colony Bank Of Dodge County .
2008-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colony Bank in Fitzgerald, Georgia.
Total assets: $82,310,000
Total deposits: $72,594,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Colony Bank of Dodge County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Colony Bank of Dodge County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Colony Bank of Dodge County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23229