Georgia – Coffee – Broxton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Coffee
Broxton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19653
1946
FDIC Certificate Number: 19653
FDIC's unique number: 13452
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 20839
Report Date: 2008-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-13
1946-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Broxton State Bank.
1996-12-01 Reorganized.
1997-11-21 Changed name to Colony Bank Southeast .
2008-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colony Bank in Fitzgerald, Georgia.
Total assets: $210,389,000
Total deposits: $174,793,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Colony Bank Southeast does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Colony Bank Southeast, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Colony Bank Southeast will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9250