Nebraska – Scotts Bluff – Scottsbluff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Nebraska
Scotts Bluff
Scottsbluff
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
24787
1941
FDIC Certificate Number: 24787
FDIC's unique number: 17195
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Island
Federal Reserve ID Number: 928757
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1941-07-30 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Commerce Savings Scottsbluff, Inc.
1983-11-09 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1983-11-09 Became FDIC insured.
1983-11-09 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1988-07-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Gering State Bank in Gering, Nebraska.
1992-09-11 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1993-01-04 Changed name to Gering State Bank And Trust Company .
1995-05-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Bayard in Bayard, Nebraska.
1996-06-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Valley Bank and Trust Co. in Scottsbluff, Nebraska.
1999-01-04 Acquired Wauneta Falls Bank, National Association in Wauneta, Nebraska.
1999-01-04 Acquired Ogallala National Bank in Ogallala, Nebraska.
2001-09-17 Acquired Community Bank-dove Creek in Dove Creek, Colorado.
Total assets: $11,283,000
Total deposits: $10,285,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Commerce Savings Scottsbluff, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Commerce Savings Scottsbluff, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commerce Savings Scottsbluff, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7900