Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
33946
1994
FDIC Certificate Number: 33946
FDIC's unique number: 55115
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2246941
Report Date: 1998-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-10
1994-10-17 Institution established. Original name: Commercial Bank Of Nevada.
1998-06-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama.
1998-08-13 Acquired Commercial National Bank in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1998-09-18 Acquired Firstbank in Dallas, Texas.
1998-10-02 Acquired First Macon Bank & Trust Company in Macon, Georgia.
1998-10-07 Acquired Prime Bank Of Central Florida in Titusville, Florida.
1998-10-14 Acquired Interwest Bank in Fallon, Nevada.
1998-12-01 Acquired Texas Bank And Trust in Dallas, Texas.
2002-03-29 Acquired First Mercantile Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2002-10-18 Acquired Palm Beach National Bank & Trust Company in Palm Beach, Florida.
2003-08-08 Changed name to Colonial Bank, National Association .
2003-08-08 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2003-08-08 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2003-12-04 Acquired Sarasota Bank in Sarasota, Florida.
2005-02-10 Acquired Union Bank Of Florida in Lauderhill, Florida.
2005-06-02 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Lake County in Leesburg, Florida.
2007-06-08 Acquired Commercial Bank Of Florida in Miami, Florida.
2007-12-13 Acquired Citrus And Chemical Bank in Bartow, Florida.
2008-06-10 Changed name to Colonial Bank .
2008-06-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2008-06-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-08-14 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2009-08-14 FDIC closing information for
Colonial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/colonial-al.html.
Total assets: $131,341,000
Total deposits: $119,693,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Commercial Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Commercial Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commercial Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22827