Georgia – Troup – Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Troup
Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15848
1941
FDIC Certificate Number: 15848
FDIC's unique number: 10088
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 884639
Report Date: 2010-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-14
1941-09-15 Institution established. Original name: La Grange Banking Company.
1980-10-31 Changed name to Commercial Bank & Trust Company Of Troup County .
2009-10-14 Moved bank headquarters from La Grange, Georgia to Lagrange, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Synovus Bank in Columbus, Georgia.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.
Total assets: $321,908,000
Total deposits: $266,636,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Commercial Bank & Trust Company of Troup County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Commercial Bank & Trust Company of Troup County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commercial Bank & Trust Company of Troup County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24435