Iowa – Muscatine – Muscatine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.commbk.net
Iowa
Muscatine
Muscatine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
23189
1980
FDIC Certificate Number: 23189
FDIC's unique number: 16245
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1015841
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-09-17
1980-08-11 Institution established. Original name: Community National Bank Of Muscatine.
1992-12-15 Changed name to Community Bank Of Muscatine .
1992-12-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1995-04-13 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1997-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank Of Columbus Junction in Columbus Junction, Iowa.
1997-07-01 Changed name to Community Bank .
2006-01-03 Acquired Wilton Savings Bank in Wilton, Iowa.
Total assets: $235,502,000
Total deposits: $210,436,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $210,436,000
Equity capital: $24,200,000
Net income: $960,000
Return on Assets: 0.82
Return on Equity: 8.09
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: C-B-g, Inc.
Community Bank - Columbus Junction Branch
Community Bank - Community Bank
Community Bank - Park Ave Branch
Community Bank - Wapello Branch
Community Bank - Wilton Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1447