Mississippi – Sunflower – Indianola
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.communitybank.net
Mississippi
Sunflower
Indianola
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
1089
1932
FDIC Certificate Number: 1089
FDIC's unique number: 734
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms
Federal Reserve ID Number: 901844
Report Date: 2004-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24580
The date of the last data update: 2005-02-14
1932-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Peoples Bank Of Indianola.
1986-10-01 Acquired The Bank Of The Delta in Indianola, Mississippi.
1986-10-01 Changed name to Peoples Bank Of The Delta .
1991-10-10 Changed name to Peoples Bank .
1992-01-31 Changed name to Peoples Bank Of Mississippi .
1995-07-13 Changed name to Community Bank .
2005-01-24 Changed name to Community Bank, Indianola, National Association .
2005-01-24 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-01-24 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2005-01-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-04 Moved bank headquarters from Indianola, Mississippi to Memphis, Tennessee.
2009-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank, North Mississippi in Amory, Mississippi.
Total assets: $92,281,000
Total deposits: $82,944,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank, Indianola, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank, Indianola, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank, Indianola, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11598