Kentucky – Nelson – Bardstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.cbkyonline.com
Kentucky
Nelson
Bardstown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
31626
1925
FDIC Certificate Number: 31626
FDIC's unique number: 44460
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 440174
Report Date: 2003-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-12-12
1925-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Nelson County Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1995-10-12 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1996-07-02 Changed name to Nelson County Federal Savings Bank .
1996-07-02 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-04-02 Changed name to Ncf Bank & Trust Company .
1997-04-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1997-04-02 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2000-06-29 Changed name to Community Bank Of Kentucky .
2000-08-01 Changed name to Community Bank Of Kentucky, Inc. .
2003-12-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank of Southern Indiana in New Albany, Indiana.
2005-10-26 Changed name to Your Community Bank .
Total assets: $68,066,000
Total deposits: $45,175,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank of Kentucky, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank of Kentucky, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank of Kentucky, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19524