Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
34043
1995
FDIC Certificate Number: 34043
FDIC's unique number: 56021
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2319676
Report Date: 2009-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2009-08-19
1995-07-14 Institution established. Original name: Community Bank Of Nevada.
2005-08-27 Acquired Bank Of Commerce in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-10-14 Acquired Valley Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-08-14 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Deposit Insurance National Bank of Las Vegas in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-08-14 FDIC closing information for
Community Bank Of Nevada : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/community-nv.html.
2009-09-14 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $1,397,798,000
Total deposits: $1,372,744,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-601