West Virginia – Randolph – Elkins
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
West Virginia
Randolph
Elkins
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
13896
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 13896
FDIC's unique number: 8689
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 483724
Report Date: 1992-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14002
The date of the last data update: 1992-11-30
1934-02-14 Institution established. Original name: The Tygarts Valley National Bank Of Elkins.
1991-08-31 Reorganized.
1991-08-31 Changed name to Community Bank & Trust National Association Of Randolph County .
1992-11-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank and Trust of Randolph County in Elkins, West Virginia.
1993-10-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank & Trust in Clarksburg, West Virginia.
1993-11-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Huntington National Bank West Virginia in Morgantown, West Virginia.
1994-04-08 Acquired Huntington Bank Parkersburg, Inc. in Parkersburg, West Virginia.
1994-08-19 Moved bank headquarters from Morgantown, West Virginia to Charleston, West Virginia.
1994-08-19 Acquired Huntington Bank Charleston National Association in Charleston, West Virginia.
1994-10-07 Acquired Huntington Bank Martinsburg National Association in Martinsburg, West Virginia.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-old State Bank in Fremont, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-commercial Bank in Greenville, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-sault Bank in Sault Ste. Marie, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-lumberman's Bank in Muskegon, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Zeeland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-oceana Bank in Hart, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-northwestern Bank in Boyne City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-reed City Bank in Reed City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-state Savings Bank in Lowell, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-maynard Allen Bank in Portland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-security Bank in Manistee, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-community Bank in Dowagiac, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-arcadia Bank in Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-trust in Holland Township, Michigan.
1997-10-31 Acquired The Bank Of Winter Park in Winter Park, Florida.
1999-01-29 Acquired The Huntington State Bank in Alexandria, Ohio.
1999-06-30 Reorganized.
2000-06-23 Acquired The Empire National Bank Of Traverse City in Traverse City, Michigan.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Bank, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Financial Services Group, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2007-08-31 Acquired Sky Trust, National Association in Pepper Pike, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Acquired Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $32,352,000
Total deposits: $28,597,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Bank & Trust National Association of Randolph County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Bank & Trust National Association of Randolph County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Bank & Trust National Association of Randolph County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8998