Missouri – Howell – West Plains
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.cfbankco.com
Missouri
Howell
West Plains
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34610
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34610
FDIC's unique number: 60833
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2615220
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-01-14
1997-11-13 Institution established. Original name: Community First National Bank Of West Plains, West Plains, Missouri.
2003-03-10 Acquired Bank Of Evening Shade in Mountain Home, Arkansas.
2003-03-10 Changed name to Community First National Bank Of West Plains .
2009-12-29 Changed name to Community First Banking Company .
2009-12-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-12-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
Total assets: $132,031,000
Total deposits: $113,408,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $113,408,000
Equity capital: $13,965,000
Net income: $1,023,000
Return on Assets: 1.56
Return on Equity: 15.18
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Community Bancshares Of West Plains, Inc
Community First Banking Company - Community First Banking Compan
Community First Banking Company - Mountain Grove Branch
Community First Banking Company - West Plains Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Community First Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community First Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community First Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5540