New Hampshire – Grafton – Plymouth
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.cgsb.com
New Hampshire
Grafton
Plymouth
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
27252
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 27252
FDIC's unique number: 39339
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1216059
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1988-05-23 Institution established. Original name: Community Guaranty Savings Bank.
1989-06-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2002-11-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2002-11-15 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $106,274,000
Total deposits: $91,045,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $91,045,000
Equity capital: $8,892,000
Net income: $259,000
Return on Assets: 0.5
Return on Equity: 6.02
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Community Guaranty Corporation
Community Guaranty Savings Bank - Campton Branch
Community Guaranty Savings Bank - Community Guaranty Savings Ban
No associations
LandOfFree
Community Guaranty Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community Guaranty Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community Guaranty Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7960