Minnesota – Mille Lacs – Princeton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Mille Lacs
Princeton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
22483
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 22483
FDIC's unique number: 15677
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 879158
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1977-06-23 Institution established. Original name: Community State Bank Of Princeton.
1990-04-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peoples Bank of Commerce in Cambridge, Minnesota.
Total assets: $9,886,000
Total deposits: $9,407,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Community State Bank of Princeton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Community State Bank of Princeton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community State Bank of Princeton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13746