Pennsylvania – Dauphin – Millersburg
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
Dauphin
Millersburg
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12984
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 12984
FDIC's unique number: 8206
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Harrisburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 138211
Report Date: 2007-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-11-29
1911-03-11 Institution established. Original name: The People's State Bank.
1998-04-01 Reorganized.
2001-03-31 Acquired The Glen Rock State Bank in Glen Rock, Pennsylvania.
2002-01-01 Acquired Community Banks, National Association in Millersburg, Pennsylvania.
2002-01-01 Changed name to Community Banks .
2002-01-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2002-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from East Berlin, Pennsylvania to Millersburg, Pennsylvania.
2005-07-01 Acquired Blue Ball National Bank in Blue Ball, Pennsylvania.
2005-09-01 Changed name to Communitybanks .
2005-11-07 Acquired Pennrock Financial Advisors, National Association in Blue Ball, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-15 Acquired Sentry Trust Company in Chambersburg, Pennsylvania.
2007-04-01 Acquired East Prospect State Bank in East Prospect, Pennsylvania.
2007-04-01 Acquired Bucs Federal Bank in Owings Mills, Maryland.
2007-11-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Susquehanna Bank PA in Lititz, Pennsylvania.
2008-10-11 Changed name to Susquehanna Bank .
2008-10-11 Acquired Susquehanna Bank Dv in Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania.
2008-10-11 Acquired Susquehanna Bank in Hagerstown, Maryland.
2011-10-01 Acquired Abington Savings Bank in Jenkintown, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $3,782,352,000
Total deposits: $2,631,805,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
CommunityBanks does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with CommunityBanks, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and CommunityBanks will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4649