Kentucky – Grant – Corinth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kentucky
Grant
Corinth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
15051
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 15051
FDIC's unique number: 9438
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 801917
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21358
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Corinth Deposit Bank.
1987-05-01 Changed name to Corinth Deposit National Bank .
1990-04-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Whitaker Bank in Lexington, Kentucky.
1993-10-08 Changed name to Whitaker Bank, National Association .
1993-10-08 Moved bank headquarters from Corinth, Kentucky to Lexington, Kentucky.
1997-07-01 Acquired The Garrard Bank & Trust Company in Lancaster, Kentucky.
1997-07-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Carlisle in Carlisle, Kentucky.
2000-09-30 Acquired Powell County Bank, National Association in Campton, Kentucky.
2001-07-16 Acquired The Bank Of Whitesburg in Whitesburg, Kentucky.
2002-07-01 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2004-05-03 Changed name to Whitaker Bank .
2004-05-03 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-05-03 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2004-05-22 Acquired First National Bank And Trust Company in Georgetown, Kentucky.
2004-05-22 Acquired The State National Bank Of Frankfort in Frankfort, Kentucky.
2004-08-21 Acquired Mount Sterling Bank in Mount Sterling, Kentucky.
2004-08-21 Acquired Morehead Bank in Morehead, Kentucky.
2008-07-01 Acquired State Bank & Trust Company in Harrodsburg, Kentucky.
Total assets: $8,744,000
Total deposits: $8,652,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Corinth Deposit National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Corinth Deposit National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Corinth Deposit National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5316