Minnesota – Washington – Stillwater
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Washington
Stillwater
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10189
1919
FDIC Certificate Number: 10189
FDIC's unique number: 6529
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 204255
Report Date: 1991-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-07-23
1919-06-25 Institution established. Original name: Cosmopolitan State Bank Of Stillwater.
1991-04-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Central Bank in Stillwater, Minnesota.
2009-08-28 Acquired Mainstreet Bank in Forest Lake, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-02 Acquired Jennings State Bank in Spring Grove, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-23 Acquired Riverview Community Bank in Otsego, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-11-20 Acquired Commerce Bank Of Southwest Florida in Fort Myers, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-15 Acquired Rosemount National Bank in Rosemount, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-10-07 Acquired The Riverbank in Wyoming, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $47,092,000
Total deposits: $42,863,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Cosmopolitan State Bank of Stillwater does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Cosmopolitan State Bank of Stillwater, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cosmopolitan State Bank of Stillwater will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7107