Kansas – Jefferson – Meriden
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.countrysidebank.com
Kansas
Jefferson
Meriden
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13734
1890
FDIC Certificate Number: 13734
FDIC's unique number: 8585
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 269656
Report Date: 2004-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-05-19
1890-03-03 Institution established. Original name: The State Bank Of Meriden.
2002-04-26 Changed name to Countryside Bank .
2004-05-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Denison State Bank in Holton, Kansas.
2008-02-22 Moved bank headquarters from Meriden, Kansas to Holton, Kansas.
Total assets: $33,604,000
Total deposits: $29,363,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Countryside Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Countryside Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Countryside Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1525