Missouri – Chariton – Brunswick
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.countybankonline.com
Missouri
Chariton
Brunswick
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
12220
1877
FDIC Certificate Number: 12220
FDIC's unique number: 7765
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1016848
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-16
1877-04-02 Institution established. Original name: Commerce Bank Of Brunswick.
1984-08-03 Changed name to Chariton County Bank .
2004-05-04 Changed name to County Bank .
Total assets: $79,193,000
Total deposits: $71,540,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $71,540,000
Equity capital: $5,883,000
Net income: $376,000
Return on Assets: 0.95
Return on Equity: 12.86
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Chariton County Bancshares, Inc.
County Bank - County Bank
County Bank - Mendon Branch
County Bank - Moberly Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20771