Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.cronebank.com
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
25620
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25620
FDIC's unique number: 17541
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 639567
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 20291
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1984-07-30 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Marin.
1996-06-28 Changed organization type to Credit Card Bank.
1998-11-03 Reorganized.
1998-11-03 Moved bank headquarters from San Rafael, California to Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-02-01 Changed name to Credit One Bank, National Association .
Total assets: $86,961,000
Total deposits: $2,719,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,719,000
Equity capital: $59,743,000
Net income: $8,133,000
Return on Assets: 18.31
Return on Equity: 26.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
Credit One Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Credit One Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Credit One Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26403