New Jersey – Middlesex – Edison
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Jersey
Middlesex
Edison
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28358
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 28358
FDIC's unique number: 41192
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 78979
Report Date: 1994-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-12-06
1908-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Crestmont Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-12-31 Acquired Crestmont Savings And Loan Association in Maplewood, New Jersey.
1987-01-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1987-11-30 Moved bank headquarters from Maplewood, New Jersey to Edison Township, New Jersey.
1990-11-09 Moved bank headquarters from Edison Township, New Jersey to Edison, New Jersey.
1994-09-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Summit, New Jersey.
1996-01-16 Acquired Garden State Bank in Jackson, New Jersey.
1996-07-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
1997-02-08 Acquired Central Jersey Savings Bank, Sla in East Brunswick, New Jersey.
1997-06-07 Acquired The Bank Of Mid-jersey in Bordentown, New Jersey.
1998-03-14 Acquired Collective Bank in Egg Harbor, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $1,045,787,000
Total deposits: $778,197,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Crestmont Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Crestmont Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Crestmont Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13900