Oklahoma – McIntosh – Checotah
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Oklahoma
McIntosh
Checotah
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32694
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 32694
FDIC's unique number: 45528
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 494971
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-24
1989-07-12 Institution established. Original name: Cross Roads Federal Savings And Loan Association, FA.
1989-07-13 Acquired Cross Roads Savings And Loan Association in Checotah, Oklahoma.
1989-07-13 Entered into a conservatorship.
1990-05-11 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples National Bank of Checotah in Checotah, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $12,822,000
Total deposits: $16,075,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Cross Roads Federal Savings and Loan Association, FA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Cross Roads Federal Savings and Loan Association, FA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cross Roads Federal Savings and Loan Association, FA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6527