Kentucky – Pulaski – Somerset
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.csbweb.com
Kentucky
Pulaski
Somerset
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
11358
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 11358
FDIC's unique number: 7257
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 202514
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1909-08-13 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank.
1985-08-01 Acquired Bank Of Somerset in Somerset, Kentucky.
1985-08-01 Changed name to Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. .
1985-08-01 Moved bank headquarters from Eubank, Kentucky to Somerset, Kentucky.
1997-02-05 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $157,949,000
Total deposits: $125,786,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $125,786,000
Equity capital: $20,251,000
Net income: $1,843,000
Return on Assets: 2.33
Return on Equity: 18.65
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Commerce Bancorp, Inc.
Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. - Cumberland Security Bank, Inc.
Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. - Eubank Branch
Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. - Somerset Branch
Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. - South Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Cumberland Security Bank, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26219