New Jersey – Hudson – Jersey City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.chase.com
New Jersey
Hudson
Jersey City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
25809
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25809
FDIC's unique number: 32038
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 931319
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-07-21
1984-12-24 Institution established. Original name: Custodial Trust Company.
1990-12-03 Moved bank headquarters from Trenton, New Jersey to Princeton, New Jersey.
2008-03-04 Changed name to Bear Stearns Bank & Trust .
2008-04-18 Changed name to Custodial Trust Company .
2009-06-16 Moved bank headquarters from Princeton, New Jersey to Jersey City, New Jersey.
Total assets: $300,962,000
Total deposits: $35,506,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $35,506,000
Equity capital: $261,749,000
Net income: $98,000
Return on Assets: 0.06
Return on Equity: 0.07
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Jpmorgan Chase & Co.
No associations
LandOfFree
Custodial Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Custodial Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Custodial Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2802