South Dakota – Turner – Chancellor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.dakotaheritage.com
South Dakota
Turner
Chancellor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
12643
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 12643
FDIC's unique number: 8025
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 100553
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1904-05-26 Institution established. Original name: The Chancellor State Bank.
1984-02-17 Changed name to Dakota Heritage State Bank .
Total assets: $37,531,000
Total deposits: $32,089,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $32,089,000
Equity capital: $4,367,000
Net income: $196,000
Return on Assets: 1.06
Return on Equity: 9.18
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Dakota Heritage Banking Corporation
No associations
LandOfFree
Dakota Heritage State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Dakota Heritage State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Dakota Heritage State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19969