South Dakota – Hutchinson – Tripp
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
South Dakota
Hutchinson
Tripp
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
6083
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 6083
FDIC's unique number: 4107
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 558051
Report Date: 1986-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1902-02-02 Institution established. Original name: Dakota State Bank, Of Tripp, South Dakota.
1986-09-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First State Bank in Armour, South Dakota.
1989-09-30 Moved bank headquarters from Tripp, South Dakota to Armour, South Dakota.
Total assets: $15,334,000
Total deposits: $13,312,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Dakota State Bank, of Tripp, South Dakota does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Dakota State Bank, of Tripp, South Dakota, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Dakota State Bank, of Tripp, South Dakota will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14509