Louisiana – Ouachita – Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Louisiana
Ouachita
Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32122
1982
FDIC Certificate Number: 32122
FDIC's unique number: 44956
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 417073
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1982-04-13 Institution established. Original name: Deposit Trust Savings Savings And Loan Association Incorporated.
1987-01-31 Changed name to Deposit Trust Savings Bank .
1987-01-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1990-01-11 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Deposit Trust Federal Savings Bank in Monroe, Louisiana.
1990-12-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Republic Bank in Rayville, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BancorpSouth Bank in Tupelo, Mississippi.
2000-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Texarkana, Arkansas.
2002-02-28 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2004-12-31 Acquired Premier Bank Of Brentwood in Brentwood, Tennessee.
2004-12-31 Acquired The Business Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2005-12-01 Acquired American State Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired First Kensington Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2007-07-02 Acquired The Signature Bank in Springfield, Missouri.
Total assets: $97,966,000
Total deposits: $91,712,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Deposit Trust Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Deposit Trust Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Deposit Trust Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14113