New Hampshire – Rockingham – Derry
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Derry
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31166
1915
FDIC Certificate Number: 31166
FDIC's unique number: 44000
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1976-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1976-11-30
1915-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Derry Co-operative Bank.
1976-11-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of United Federal Bank, FSB in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1981-12-31 Acquired Concord Federal Savings And Loan Association in Concord, New Hampshire.
1986-06-18 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1986-06-19 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1986-06-19 Changed name to United Savings Bank .
1986-06-19 Changed from the Savings Association Insurance Fund to the Bank Insurance Fund.
1986-06-19 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
1990-01-01 Changed name to Dartmouth Bank .
1990-01-01 Acquired The Saver's Bank in Littleton, New Hampshire.
1990-01-01 Acquired Belknap Bank & Trust in Belmont, New Hampshire.
1990-01-01 Acquired Dartmouth Banking Company in Hanover, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New Dartmouth Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-12-18 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1992-06-26 Acquired The Somersworth Bank in Somersworth, New Hampshire.
1994-06-06 Changed name to Shawmut Bank Nh .
1994-06-06 Reorganized.
1995-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet Bank-NH in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1996-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Manchester, New Hampshire to Nashua, New Hampshire.
1997-05-23 Moved bank headquarters from Nashua, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Derry Co-operative Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Derry Co-operative Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Derry Co-operative Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23052