Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.db.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
26392
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 26392
FDIC's unique number: 33000
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 304913
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-23
1985-10-07 Institution established. Original name: Bankers Trust.
1985-10-07 Changed trust powers to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2002-04-15 Changed name to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Delaware .
Total assets: $451,188,000
Total deposits: $2,043,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,043,000
Equity capital: $278,169,000
Net income: $5,900,000
Return on Assets: 2.68
Return on Equity: 4.29
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Deutsche Bank Aktiengesellschaft
No associations
LandOfFree
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Deutsche Bank Trust Company Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13756