New Hampshire – Strafford – Durham
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Strafford
Durham
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
16927
1947
FDIC Certificate Number: 16927
FDIC's unique number: 11010
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 244505
Report Date: 1991-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-11-20
1947-06-18 Institution established. Original name: Durham Trust Company.
1991-11-15 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Granite Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1992-09-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1997-11-01 Acquired Primary Bank in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
2004-05-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Ocean National Bank in Kennebunk, Maine.
2004-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Keene, New Hampshire to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2007-06-29 Changed name to Ocean Bank .
2007-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-11-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Company in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $71,024,000
Total deposits: $68,528,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Durham Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Durham Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Durham Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3339