Pennsylvania – Lackawanna – Scranton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
Lackawanna
Scranton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
6029
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 6029
FDIC's unique number: 4075
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1971-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-01-12
1923-06-30 Institution established. Original name: East Scranton State Bank.
1971-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Penn Security Bank and Trust Company in Scranton, Pennsylvania.
1973-03-05 Acquired Green Ridge Bank in Scranton, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-31 Reorganized.
2009-04-01 Acquired Old Forge Bank in Old Forge, Pennsylvania.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
East Scranton State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with East Scranton State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and East Scranton State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10998