District of Columbia – District of Columbia – Washington
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
District of Columbia
District of Columbia
Washington
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
27792
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 27792
FDIC's unique number: 40626
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 661577
Report Date: 1981-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Eastern-liberty Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National Permanent Bank, FSB in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1986-08-01 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1986-08-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1986-08-31 Changed name to Citicorp Savings Of Washington, Dc A Federal Savings And Loan Associatio .
1990-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1990-04-30 Changed name to Citibank, Federal Savings Bank .
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, Federal Savings Bank in San Francisco, California.
1991-01-31 Acquired Citibank, Federal Savings Bank in Chicago, Illinois.
1991-04-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1991-04-01 Acquired Brookfield Federal Bank For Savings in Brookfield, Illinois.
1993-03-31 Acquired Citibank, Federal Savings Bank in Miami, Florida.
2002-11-12 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Reston, Virginia.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-10-01 Changed name to Cfsb, National Association .
2006-10-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-10-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2006-10-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Eastern-Liberty Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Eastern-Liberty Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Eastern-Liberty Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25380