Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
34682
1998
FDIC Certificate Number: 34682
FDIC's unique number: 61193
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2723796
Report Date: 2009-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2009-08-25
1998-08-17 Institution established. Original name: Commerce Bank.
1999-10-15 Changed name to Ebank .
2009-08-21 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Stearns Bank National Association in Saint Cloud, Minnesota.
2009-08-21 FDIC closing information for
Ebank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/ebank.html.
Total assets: $144,688,000
Total deposits: $131,510,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Ebank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Ebank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ebank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24005