Kansas – Greenwood – Eureka
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Greenwood
Eureka
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
15065
1935
FDIC Certificate Number: 15065
FDIC's unique number: 9448
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wichita
Federal Reserve ID Number: 920751
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14329
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1935-04-03 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens National Bank In Eureka.
1989-10-16 Changed name to Emprise Bank, National Association .
1990-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Emprise Bank in Iola, Kansas.
1993-12-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2005-05-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Emprise Bank in Wichita, Kansas.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Prairie State Bank in Augusta, Kansas.
Total assets: $22,253,000
Total deposits: $20,409,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Emprise Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Emprise Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Emprise Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23429