Minnesota – Hennepin – Hopkins
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.equitybankmn.com
Minnesota
Hennepin
Hopkins
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
16635
1937
FDIC Certificate Number: 16635
FDIC's unique number: 10775
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 310754
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-12-19
1937-03-01 Institution established. Original name: Security State Bank Of Claremont.
1999-12-01 Moved bank headquarters from Claremont, Minnesota to Blooming Prairie, Minnesota.
1999-12-01 Changed name to Alliance Bank Of Blooming Prairie .
2001-09-22 Changed name to Equity Bank .
2002-10-21 Moved bank headquarters from Blooming Prairie, Minnesota to Dodge Center, Minnesota.
2008-07-10 Moved bank headquarters from Dodge Center, Minnesota to Minnetonka, Minnesota.
Total assets: $51,896,000
Total deposits: $44,502,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $44,502,000
Equity capital: $7,284,000
Net income: $-96,000
Return on Assets: -0.37
Return on Equity: -2.6
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Equity Bank Holding Company, Inc.
Equity Bank - Claremont Branch
Equity Bank - Equity Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Equity Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Equity Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Equity Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11469