Pennsylvania – Northampton – Easton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Pennsylvania
Northampton
Easton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30948
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 30948
FDIC's unique number: 43782
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 714679
Report Date: 1983-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Fairview Savings And Loan Association.
1983-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Savings Association in Mount Pocono, Pennsylvania.
1984-03-31 Acquired Colonial Savings Association in Wrightsville, Pennsylvania.
1984-03-31 Acquired Athens Bl And Savings Association in Athens, Pennsylvania.
1984-10-31 Acquired Sayre Savings And Loan Association in Sayre, Pennsylvania.
2004-05-20 Changed name to Citizens Savings Bank .
2004-05-20 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2004-05-20 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2004-05-20 Moved bank headquarters from Mount Pocono, Pennsylvania to Clarks Summit, Pennsylvania.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Fairview Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fairview Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fairview Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24784