Kansas – Graham – Hill City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fmbhillcity.com
Kansas
Graham
Hill City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
27178
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 27178
FDIC's unique number: 39018
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1166435
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1988-02-18 Institution established. Original name: Farmers And Merchants Bank Of Hill City.
1988-02-18 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants Bank Of Hill City in Hill City, Kansas.
1989-03-16 Acquired The Farmers State Bank, Bogue, Kansas in Bogue, Kansas.
Total assets: $39,215,000
Total deposits: $34,439,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $34,439,000
Equity capital: $4,603,000
Net income: $45,000
Return on Assets: 0.23
Return on Equity: 1.96
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Stockton Bancshares, Inc.
Farmers And Merchants Bank Of Hill City - Bogue Branch
Farmers And Merchants Bank Of Hill City - Farmers And Merchants
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15503