Minnesota – Faribault – Minnesota Lake
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Faribault
Minnesota Lake
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
5210
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 5210
FDIC's unique number: 3498
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato
Federal Reserve ID Number: 692058
Report Date: 1998-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-02-26
1902-11-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers National Bank Of Minnesota Lake.
1993-03-29 Changed name to Farmers Bank .
1993-03-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1999-01-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Rural American Bank-North Mankato in North Mankato, Minnesota.
1999-06-15 Changed name to Valley Bank .
2006-09-11 Moved bank headquarters from North Mankato, Minnesota to Waterville, Minnesota.
2006-09-11 Acquired Rural American Bank - Hector/fairfax in Hector, Minnesota.
2006-09-11 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Waterville in Waterville, Minnesota.
2009-07-27 Acquired Valley Bank Minnesota in Jordan, Minnesota.
2010-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Frandsen Bank & Trust in Lonsdale, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Braham in Braham, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Luck in Luck, Wisconsin.
2011-08-22 Acquired Queen City Federal Savings Bank in Virginia, Minnesota.
Total assets: $16,326,000
Total deposits: $13,537,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25193