Maryland – Wicomico – Mardela Springs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Maryland
Wicomico
Mardela Springs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1574
1912
FDIC Certificate Number: 1574
FDIC's unique number: 1031
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 43922
Report Date: 1997-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-07-22
1912-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers Bank.
1997-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peninsula Bank in Princess Anne, Maryland.
2000-12-01 Acquired The Bank Of Fruitland in Fruitland, Maryland.
2004-08-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
Total assets: $28,892,000
Total deposits: $26,361,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3426