Pennsylvania – York – Hanover
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
York
Hanover
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12995
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 12995
FDIC's unique number: 8213
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Harrisburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 159113
Report Date: 1994-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-09
1906-10-23 Institution established. Original name: Farmers' Bank And Trust Company Of Hanover.
1974-12-31 Changed name to Farmers Bank And Trust Company Of Hanover .
1978-09-05 Acquired Abbottstown State Bank in Abbottstown, Pennsylvania.
1983-05-19 Acquired The First National Bank Of Fairfield in Fairfield, Pennsylvania.
1994-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Dauphin Deposit Bank and Trust Company in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
1995-06-07 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1998-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Maryland in Baltimore, Maryland.
1998-12-31 Changed name to Fmb Bank .
1999-06-28 Changed name to Allfirst Bank .
2003-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company in Buffalo, New York.
2003-06-14 Acquired Allfirst Trust Company National Association in Mclean, Virginia.
2003-06-14 Acquired Allfirst Trust Company Of Pennsylvania, National Association in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2003-07-04 Acquired Allfirst Financial Center National Association in Millsboro, Delaware.
2007-11-30 Acquired Partners Trust Municipal Bank in Utica, New York.
2007-11-30 Acquired Partners Trust Bank in Utica, New York.
2009-05-23 Acquired Provident Bank Of Maryland in Baltimore, Maryland.
2009-08-28 Acquired Bradford Bank in Baltimore, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-05 Acquired K Bank in Randallstown, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $575,153,000
Total deposits: $477,053,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Bank and Trust Company of Hanover does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Bank and Trust Company of Hanover, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Bank and Trust Company of Hanover will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22116