Kentucky – Hardin – Vine Grove
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Hardin
Vine Grove
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11364
1893
FDIC Certificate Number: 11364
FDIC's unique number: 7261
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 111447
Report Date: 1999-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-01-13
1893-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers Bank Of Vine Grove.
1999-11-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company in Bardstown, Kentucky.
2001-07-20 Acquired The Citizens Bank And Trust Company Of Grayson County in Leitchfield, Kentucky.
Total assets: $34,047,000
Total deposits: $32,777,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers Bank of Vine Grove does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers Bank of Vine Grove, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers Bank of Vine Grove will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8697