Pennsylvania – Wayne – Honesdale
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Pennsylvania
Wayne
Honesdale
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12987
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 12987
FDIC's unique number: 8209
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 526210
Report Date: 1995-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-03-08
1923-08-24 Institution established. Original name: Farmers & Merchants Bank.
1996-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Citizens National Bank of Lansford in Lansford, Pennsylvania.
1999-01-22 Changed name to The Citizens National Bank .
1999-01-22 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Slatington in Slatington, Pennsylvania.
2000-04-28 Acquired Citizens Bank And Trust Company in Palmerton, Pennsylvania.
2004-03-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Harleysville National Bank and Trust Company in Harleysville, Pennsylvania.
2004-04-30 Acquired Millennium Bank in Malvern, Pennsylvania.
2007-11-16 Acquired East Penn Bank in Emmaus, Pennsylvania.
2008-12-06 Acquired Willow Financial Bank in Wayne, Pennsylvania.
2010-04-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Niagara Bank, National Association in Buffalo, New York.
2011-04-15 Acquired Newalliance Bank in New Haven, Connecticut.
Total assets: $63,199,000
Total deposits: $53,281,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers & Merchants Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers & Merchants Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers & Merchants Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4646