South Dakota – Hutchinson – Kaylor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
South Dakota
Hutchinson
Kaylor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1669
1924
FDIC Certificate Number: 1669
FDIC's unique number: 1097
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 409957
Report Date: 2000-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-06-13
1924-09-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank.
2000-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers State Bank in Parkston, South Dakota.
2002-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Kaylor, South Dakota to Parkston, South Dakota.
Total assets: $10,549,000
Total deposits: $8,247,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8114