South Dakota – Hutchinson – Parkston
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fsbparkston.com
South Dakota
Hutchinson
Parkston
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1686
1919
FDIC Certificate Number: 1686
FDIC's unique number: 1109
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 120953
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1919-07-19 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank.
2000-04-01 Acquired Farmers State Bank in Kaylor, South Dakota.
Total assets: $134,438,000
Total deposits: $116,478,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $116,478,000
Equity capital: $17,339,000
Net income: $678,000
Return on Assets: 1.01
Return on Equity: 8.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Parkston Investment Company
Farmers State Bank - Farmers State Bank
Farmers State Bank - Parkston/Kaylor Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-954